Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814172

EP2814172 - Filter for RF applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bulja, Senad
c/o Alcatel-Lucent Ireland Ltd
Blanchardstown Business Tech Park
Snugborough Road
Blanchardstown Dublin 15 / IE
02 / Rulikowski, Pawel K.
c/o Alcatel-Lucent Ireland Ltd
Blanchardstown Business Tech Park
Snugborough Road
Blanchardstown Dublin 15 / IE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Bryers LLP
7 Gay Street
Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA1 2PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Lupton, Frederick
51 Bullens Green Lane
Colney Heath
St. Albans, Herts. AL4 0QR / GB
Application number, filing date13290128.110.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814172
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03H7/06
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Filter für HF-Anwendungen[2014/51]
English:Filter for RF applications[2014/51]
French:Filtre pour applications RF[2014/51]
Examination procedure30.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
09.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/46]
26.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011080229  (KENINGTON PETER [GB]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0045] , [0046] , [0051] - [0058]; figures 1c,2e,2g *;
 [A]JP2007208350  (NIPPON DENGYO KOSAKU CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0012] , [0014]; figures 1,4,9,10,12-14 *;
 [A]  - LUCYSZYN S ET AL, "MMIC tunable active notch filter", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE, (19960523), vol. 32, no. 11, pages 980 - 981, XP006005169 [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004]; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19960658
 [A]  - BAHL ET AL, "Power Dividers/Combiners and 12.1.4 Matching Networks )", LUMPED ELEMENTS FOR RF AND MICROWAVE CIRCUITS, XX, XX, (200306), XP002427769 [A] 1-10 * section 12.1.4 MAtching Networks *
by applicantUS2011080856
 EP20120360054