blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814172 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814172



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 174
09.10.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.06.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
21.03.2018 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
20.03.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.03.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 11
09.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
09.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
24.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
25.04.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.07.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 6
30.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.05.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
30.05.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
12.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.11.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
07.10.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2013 Description Search / examination 14
28.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
28.06.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
10.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
10.06.2013 Description Search / examination 14
10.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
10.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8