blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814172


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
04.08.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
25.06.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
16.03.2018 Change - applicant published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
08.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2016 Change - representative
01.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2015 Change - designated states published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - request for examination published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
23.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
11.06.2014 Amendment by applicant