Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2682077

EP2682077 - Chamfer probe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
France Chirurgie Instrumentation SAS-FCI
20-22 rue Louis Armand
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]For all designated states
France Chirurgie Instrumentation SAS-FCI
20/22, rue Louis Armand
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Urion, Stéphane
1, rue de la Creuse
70190 Cromary / FR
 [2014/02]
Representative(s)Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan , et al
Cabinet Faber
22, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan , et al
Cabinet Faber 22, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13290130.710.06.2013
[2014/02]
Priority number, dateFR2012000191806.07.2012         Original published format: FR 1201918
[2014/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2682077
Date:08.01.2014
Language:FR
[2014/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/007
[2014/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Sonde mit Fase[2014/02]
English:Chamfer probe[2014/02]
French:Sonde à chanfrein[2014/02]
Examination procedure05.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
16.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0195/18
26.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6547765  (WALSH DAVID J [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11 * figures 1,2,4; claim 1 * * column 3, line 3 - line 48 * * column 4, line 43 - line 56 * * column 5, line 17 - line 20 * [Y] 7,8;
 [Y]US6113567  (BECKER BRUCE B [US]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5437625  (KURIHASHI KATSUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantFR2704749
 US6117116