EP2879084 - Availability watching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amadeus S.A.S. 485 Route du Pin Montard Sophia Antipolis 06410 Biot / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Amadeus S.A.S. 485 Route du Pin Montard Sophia Antipolis 06410 Biot / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magnat, Gontran 5, clos des Glaïeuls 31470 Fontenilles / FR | 02 /
Vignola, Greta Bt E - 260 Chemin des combes 06600 Antibes / FR | 03 /
Pomarede, Yann c/o Amadeus 485 Route du Pin Montard 06902 Sophia Antipolis Cedex / FR | 04 /
Sbragia, Alexandre 380 Chemin du Riou Merlet 06740 Chateauneuf de Grasse / FR | 05 /
Arnoux-Prost, Renaud 300 N Akard Street - Apt 2202 Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 13290294.1 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879084 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/30 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06Q50/14 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfügbarkeitsüberwachung | [2015/23] | English: | Availability watching | [2015/23] | French: | Disponibilité de regarder | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5781892 (HUNT DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4, lines 10-15; figure 1 *; | [I]US2003004760 (SCHIFF MARTIN R [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0046] , [0048] , [0100]; figure 2b * |