Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785083

EP2785083 - Improved wireless communication of private data between two terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2015  [2015/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Beaugrand, Fabrice
40 rue Ferdinand Buisson
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13305388.428.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785083
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/20, H04W4/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbesserte drahtlose Kommunikation von privaten Daten zwischen zwei Endgeräten[2014/40]
English:Improved wireless communication of private data between two terminals[2014/40]
French:Communication sans fil améliorée de données privées entre deux terminaux[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/40]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2011163944  (BILBREY BRETT [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * [A] 6-13;
 [XA]US2011065459  (CHENG LONG [CN] ET AL) [X] 1,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0038] , [0045] , [0047] - [0051] * [A] 2-14;
 [X]US2010156812  (STALLINGS HEATH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] *