Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785120

EP2785120 - Method and system for establishing a wireless telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.09.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.10.2015  [2015/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Zappulla, Fabrice
47 rue des Bussys
95600 EAUBONNE / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13305403.128.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785120
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/36, H04W52/38, H04W52/50, H04L29/06, H04W52/28
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Einrichtung eines drahtlosen Telekommunikationsnetzes[2014/40]
English:Method and system for establishing a wireless telecommunications network[2014/40]
French:Méthode et système pour l'établissement d'un réseau de télécommunications sans fil[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/42]
19.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006187865  (SAKAI TSUTOMU [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [I] 6;
 [X]WO02062024  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 31 - page 8, line 6 * * claim 1 *;
 [XI]US2007014409  (BATRA ANUJ [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document * [I] 4-10