Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789312

EP2789312 - Expandable stent-valve and method for manufacturing a stent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epygon Sasu
5 rue de la Baume
75008 Paris / FR
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Scorsin, Marcio
Via Dom Pedro I
1014 ap. 62
80620-130 Curitiba PR / BR
02 / Pasquino, Enrico
Strada Bricale 13
10020 Marentino / IT
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND S.A.
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
[N/P]
Application number, filing date13305461.909.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789312
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erweiterbare Stentklappe und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Stents[2014/42]
English:Expandable stent-valve and method for manufacturing a stent[2014/42]
French:Valvule/stent expansible et procédé de fabrication d'un stent[2014/42]
Examination procedure09.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
16.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
28.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011288632  (WHITE JENNIFER K [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0039] - [0054] - [ 060] - [0061] - [ 064] , [ 081] - [0085]; figures 1, 3-4, 7, 13 * [I] 4;
 [XI]US2009132035  (ROTH ALEX T [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-14 * paragraphs [0181] - [0182] - [ 0217] - [0230] - [ 0256] , [ 0262] , [ 0285]; figures 1A-1B, 12A-16J, 24A-24B, C27 * [I] 4;
 [X]US2012310328  (OLSON CHRISTOPHER [US] ET AL) [X] 1,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 107]; figure 21 *;
 [X]US2010331972  (PINTOR RAFAEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0108] , [ 0112]; figures 5A-5E *
by applicantWO2009106545
 EP1893132
 WO2008028569
 WO2012063228