Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790442

EP2790442 - CONTROL SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHODS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM STORING INSTRUCTIONS FOR A NETWORK NODE AND/OR A NETWORK CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]Control system, apparatus, methods, and computer readable storage medium storing instructions for a network node and/or a network controller
[2017/36]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Roessler, Horst
c/o Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Milbrandt, Jens
c/o Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Derakhshan, Fariborz
c/o Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Thurn-und-Taxix-Strasse 10
90411 Nürnberg / DE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Menzietti, Domenico , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
Application number, filing date13305465.009.04.2013
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790442
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/931, H04W24/08, H04L12/715
[2017/34]
Former International [2014/42]H04W40/04, H04W40/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERSYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUM SPEICHERN VON ANWEISUNGEN FÜR EINEN NETZWERKKNOTEN UND/ODER EINE NETZWERKSTEUERUNG[2017/36]
English:CONTROL SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHODS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM STORING INSTRUCTIONS FOR A NETWORK NODE AND/OR A NETWORK CONTROLLER[2017/36]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉS ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR STOCKANT DES INSTRUCTIONS POUR UN NOEUD DE RÉSEAU ET/OU UN CONTRÔLEUR DE RÉSEAU[2017/36]
Former [2014/42]Steuersystem, Vorrichtung, Verfahren und computerlesbares Speichermedium zum Speichern von Anweisungen für einen Netzwerkknoten und/oder eine Netzwerksteuerung
Former [2014/42]Control system, apparatus, methods, and computer readable storage medium storing instructions for a network node and/or a network controller
Former [2014/42]Système de commande, appareil, procédés et support de stockage lisible par ordinateur stockant des instructions pour un n'ud de réseau et/ou un contrôleur de réseau
Examination procedure03.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
24.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/24]
29.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - MOHAMED SALEM ET AL, "Opportunities and Challenges in OFDMA-Based Cellular Relay Networks: A Radio Resource Management Perspective", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100601), vol. 59, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 2496 - 2510, XP011302893 [X] 1,7,13-15 * figure 1 * * section V.C.; page 2500 * * section VI. A.; page 2504 - page 2505 * * section II. A. 1 and 4.; page 2497 * [I] 2-6,8-12
by applicantEP0811016