Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797364

EP2797364 - A METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF FREQUENCY RESOURCES OF DIFFERENT OPERATORS TO USER TERMINALS, AND A BASE STATION AND A USER TERMINAL THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]A method for allocation of frequency resources of different operators to user terminals, and a base station and a user terminal therefor
[2016/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Aydin, Osman
Knappenweg 51H
70569 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Aziz, Danish
Stimpfacher Strasse 19
70435 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Bakker, Hajo
Alemannenstrasse 30-1
71735 Eberdingen / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Kleinbub, Oliver , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstr. 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date13305525.122.04.2013
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797364
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797364
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02, H04W48/10
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/44]H04W48/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON FREQUENZRESSOURCEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER BETREIBER AN BENUTZERENDGERÄTE UND BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT DAFÜR[2016/06]
English:A METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF FREQUENCY RESOURCES OF DIFFERENT OPERATORS TO USER TERMINALS, AND A BASE STATION AND A USER TERMINAL THEREFOR[2016/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES DE FRÉQUENCE DE DIFFÉRENTS OPÉRATEURS À DES TERMINAUX D'UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR CORRESPONDANT[2016/06]
Former [2014/44]Verfahren zur Zuweisung von Frequenzressourcen unterschiedlicher Betreiber an Benutzerendgeräte und Basisstation und Benutzerendgerät dafür
Former [2014/44]A method for allocation of frequency resources of different operators to user terminals, and a base station and a user terminal therefor
Former [2014/44]Procédé d'attribution de ressources de fréquence de différents opérateurs à des terminaux d'utilisateur, station de base et terminal utilisateur correspondant
Examination procedure29.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
14.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2016Fee for grant paid
18.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2016
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.04.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
LU22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU22.04.2013
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
LU22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU22.04.2013
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
LU22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU22.04.2013
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
LU22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU22.04.2013
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
LU22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
IE22.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/37]BE30.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]  - MEDIATEK INC, "Cross-carrier scheduling for carrier-based HetNet ICIC", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-120173_CROSS-CARRIER SCHEDULING IN CARRIER-BASED HETNET ICIC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG3, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050566628 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CATT, "Cross carrier scheduling for E-PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121103), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-124767, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_71/Docs/, (20121103), XP050662782 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *