Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800197

EP2800197 - Fluorinated carbonates as solvent for lithium sulfonimide-based electrolytes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster
Schlossplatz 2
48149 Münster / DE
For all designated states
Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble
46 avenue Félix Viallet
38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/12]For all designated states
Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster
Schlossplatz 2
48149 Münster / DE
For all designated states
Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble
46 avenue Félix Viallet
38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster
Schlossplatz 2
48149 Münster / DE
For all designated states
Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble
46 avenue Félix Viallet
38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Kalhoff, Julian
Von-Esmarch-Str. 171
48149 Münster / DE
02 / Bresser, Dominic
Scheibenstraße 84
48153 Münster / DE
03 / Passerini, Stefano
Am Schlossgarten 40
48149 Münster / DE
04 / Bolloli, Marco
45, avenue Jeanne d'Arc
38100 Grenoble / FR
05 / Alloin, Fannie
Chemin de la Millaudière
38220 Vizille / FR
06 / Sanchez, Jean-Yves
Le Chaboud
781 Chemin de Chartreuse
38330 Saint-Ismier / FR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13305576.402.05.2013
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800197
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800197
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/0569, H01M10/0568, H01M10/052, H01M4/66, H01G11/60, // H01G11/06
[2016/39]
Former International [2014/45]H01M10/0569, H01M10/0568, H01M10/052, H01G9/022, H01G11/06, H01G11/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fluorierte Carbonate als Lösungsmittel für Elektrolyte auf Lithiumsulfonimid-Basis[2014/45]
English:Fluorinated carbonates as solvent for lithium sulfonimide-based electrolytes[2014/45]
French:Carbonates fluorés comme solvant pour des électrolytes à base de sulfonimidure de lithium[2014/45]
Examination procedure05.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
17.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2017Fee for grant paid
06.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2016
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2013
AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GB22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GB22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/39]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GB22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/29]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GB22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GB22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/17]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2006127777  (SONY CORP.) [X] 1-7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0072] * * example 1.4; tables 1, 3 * * examples 6.1, 6.2; table 3 * * example 7.2; tables 4, 6 * * example 8.2; tables 5, 7 * * examples 12.1, 12.2; table 6 * * examples 16.1, 16.2; table 7 * * claims 1, 3 * [A] 8,11,13-15;
 [XA]EP1890357  (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORP.) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0215] * * paragraph [0293] - paragraph [0296] * * paragraph [0311] - paragraph [0312] * * examples I.2, I.4, I.6-I.10; table I.1 * * examples I.14, I.16, I.18-I.22; table I.2 * * claims 1, 3, 5-7, 21-25 * [A] 5,6,8,11,13-15;
 [XA]EP2302714  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0066] * * example 7; table 1 * * example 23; table 4 * * claims 1-6, 8, 9 * [A] 5-8,11,13-15;
 [XA]US2009253044  (MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.) [X] 1-5,10,12 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038] * * examples 13, 15; tables 1, 2 * * claims 1-3, 6, 8 * [A] 6-9,11,13-15;
 [XAI]JP2007305352  (GS YUASA CORP.) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * examples 7, C4 * [A] 4-8,13-15 [I] 11;
 [XAI]EP1630894  (SANYO COMPONENT EUROPE GMBH) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-3, 5, 10 * [A] 4-8,13-15 [I] 11;
 [XA]US2007224516  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD.; PANASONIC CORP.) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * example 1; table 1; compounds 20, 21 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15;
 [XA]EP0806804  (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO., LTD.) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 55; examples 1, 3, 8; table 1 * * page 4, lines 39-48 * * page 5, lines 6-11 * * examples G-R, X-AG; table 1 * * examples AL-AU, AZ-BF, BH-BO, BT-BX, CD-CM, CR-CY; table 4 * * examples DE-DN, DS-DZ, EB,EC, EH,EI, EK,EL, EN,EO, EQ,ER; table 4 * * claims 1-4 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15;
 [XA]EP0599534  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.; SONY CORP.) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, lines 17-24 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 16 * * example 3; table 1 * * example 22; table 4 * * claims 1, 2, 6-8, 11-15 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15
 [XA]  - M.C. SMART ET AL, "Improved performance of lithium-ion cells with the use of fluorinated carbonate-based electrolytes", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (20030601), vol. 119-121, doi:10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00266-0, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 359 - 367, XP004430195 [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * the whole document * * examples 1, 3, 8; table 1 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00266-0
by applicantUS2005031963