EP2800197 - Fluorinated carbonates as solvent for lithium sulfonimide-based electrolytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster Schlossplatz 2 48149 Münster / DE | For all designated states Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble 46 avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster Schlossplatz 2 48149 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble 46 avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster Schlossplatz 2 48149 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble 46 avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalhoff, Julian Von-Esmarch-Str. 171 48149 Münster / DE | 02 /
Bresser, Dominic Scheibenstraße 84 48153 Münster / DE | 03 /
Passerini, Stefano Am Schlossgarten 40 48149 Münster / DE | 04 /
Bolloli, Marco 45, avenue Jeanne d'Arc 38100 Grenoble / FR | 05 /
Alloin, Fannie Chemin de la Millaudière 38220 Vizille / FR | 06 /
Sanchez, Jean-Yves Le Chaboud 781 Chemin de Chartreuse 38330 Saint-Ismier / FR | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13305576.4 | 02.05.2013 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800197 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800197 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0569, H01M10/0568, H01M10/052, H01M4/66, H01G11/60, // H01G11/06 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01G11/60 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0034 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0037 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H01M10/0569, H01M10/0568, H01M10/052, H01G9/022, H01G11/06, H01G11/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fluorierte Carbonate als Lösungsmittel für Elektrolyte auf Lithiumsulfonimid-Basis | [2014/45] | English: | Fluorinated carbonates as solvent for lithium sulfonimide-based electrolytes | [2014/45] | French: | Carbonates fluorés comme solvant pour des électrolytes à base de sulfonimidure de lithium | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2013 | AL | 22.03.2017 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 02.05.2017 | LU | 02.05.2017 | MT | 02.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GB | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
MT | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 02.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 02.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006127777 (IHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0072] * * example 1.4; tables 1, 3 * * examples 6.1, 6.2; table 3 * * example 7.2; tables 4, 6 * * example 8.2; tables 5, 7 * * examples 12.1, 12.2; table 6 * * examples 16.1, 16.2; table 7 * * claims 1, 3 * [A] 8,11,13-15; | [XA]EP1890357 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0215] * * paragraph [0293] - paragraph [0296] * * paragraph [0311] - paragraph [0312] * * examples I.2, I.4, I.6-I.10; table I.1 * * examples I.14, I.16, I.18-I.22; table I.2 * * claims 1, 3, 5-7, 21-25 * [A] 5,6,8,11,13-15; | [XA]EP2302714 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0066] * * example 7; table 1 * * example 23; table 4 * * claims 1-6, 8, 9 * [A] 5-8,11,13-15; | [XA]US2009253044 (NOGI HIDENOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,12 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038] * * examples 13, 15; tables 1, 2 * * claims 1-3, 6, 8 * [A] 6-9,11,13-15; | [XAI]JP2007305352 (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * examples 7, C4 * [A] 4-8,13-15 [I] 11; | [XAI]EP1630894 (SANYO COMPONENT EUROP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-3, 5, 10 * [A] 4-8,13-15 [I] 11; | [XA]US2007224516 (DEGUCHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * example 1; table 1; compounds 20, 21 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15; | [XA]EP0806804 (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 55; examples 1, 3, 8; table 1 * * page 4, lines 39-48 * * page 5, lines 6-11 * * examples G-R, X-AG; table 1 * * examples AL-AU, AZ-BF, BH-BO, BT-BX, CD-CM, CR-CY; table 4 * * examples DE-DN, DS-DZ, EB,EC, EH,EI, EK,EL, EN,EO, EQ,ER; table 4 * * claims 1-4 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15; | [XA]EP0599534 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, lines 17-24 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 16 * * example 3; table 1 * * example 22; table 4 * * claims 1, 2, 6-8, 11-15 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15 | [XA] - M.C. SMART ET AL, "Improved performance of lithium-ion cells with the use of fluorinated carbonate-based electrolytes", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (20030601), vol. 119-121, doi:10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00266-0, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 359 - 367, XP004430195 [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * the whole document * * examples 1, 3, 8; table 1 * [A] 4-8,11,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00266-0 | by applicant | US2005031963 |