Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804324

EP2804324 - Digital phase-locked loop device with automatic frequency range selection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Microdevices Corporation
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Canard, David
c/o AKM Technology France SAS, Campus Effiscience
Innovaparc A2, 2 rue Jean Perrin
14460 Colombelles / FR
02 / Charpentier, Sébastien
c/o AKM Technology France SAS, Campus Effiscience
Innovaparc A2, 2 rue Jean Perrin
14460 Colombelles / FR
03 / Lecuyer, Matthieu
c/o AKM Technology France SAS, Campus Effiscience
Innovaparc A2, 2 rue Jean Perrin
14460 Colombelles / FR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/47]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13305613.515.05.2013
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804324
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804324
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/099, H03L7/10
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:Digitale Phasenregelkreisvorrichtung mit automatischer Frequenzbereichsauswahl[2014/47]
English:Digital phase-locked loop device with automatic frequency range selection[2014/47]
French:Dispositif de boucle à verrouillage de phase numérique avec sélection de plage de fréquence automatique[2014/47]
Examination procedure11.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
14.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2015Fee for grant paid
09.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2015
Opposition(s)18.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.05.2013
AL15.04.2015
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
LU15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU15.05.2013
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
LU15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2018/02]HU15.05.2013
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
LU15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2017/39]HU15.05.2013
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/25]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
FR15.06.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/20]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IE15.05.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/08]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
RS15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL15.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010097150  (UEDA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063]; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US2012074993  (CHEN YEN-HORNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0050]; figures 3,4 *
by applicantUS2011260762
 US7420427