Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813850

EP2813850 - Methods for predicting rheumatoid arthritis treatment response [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2017  [2017/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Vittecoq, Olivier
10, rue de la Brosse
Hameau les Souches
27310 Saint Ouen de Thouberville / FR
02 / Laguerre, Thierry
97, rue des Carmes
Hameau les Souches
76000 Rouen / FR
03 / Cosette, Pascal
48, route de Maromme
76130 Mont Saint Aigan / FR
04 / Boyer, Olivier
10, rue Malatiré
76000 Rouen / FR
05 / Le Loët, Xavier
179, rue Eau de Robec
76000 Rouen / FR
06 / Hardouin, Julie
6, rue du Hamel
76410 Tourville la Rivière / FR
07 / Obry, Antoine
13, parc de la bresle
76130 Mont Saint Aigan / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Paris, Fabienne
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13305778.610.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813850
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Vorhersage der Reaktion auf eine Behandlung von rheumatoider Arthritis[2014/51]
English:Methods for predicting rheumatoid arthritis treatment response[2014/51]
French:Procédés pour prédire une réponse de traitement de l'arthrite rhumatoïde[2014/51]
Examination procedure04.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
01.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/33]
07.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2011117366  (TC LAND EXPRESSION [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, line 31 - page 23, line 11; claims 1-28 *;
 [A]US2011052488  (DENNIS JR GLYNN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008132176  (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * claims 1-32 *;
 [A]WO2008150491  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * page 14, lines 15-36; examples 2-5; claims 1-68 *;
 [A]EP2333110  (FUNDACIO INST DE RECERCA DE L HOSPITAL UNI VALL D HEBRON [ES]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * claims 1-24 *;
 [A]WO2007038501  (THE FEINSTEIN INST MEDICAL RES [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * claims 1-26 *;
 [Y]  - DWIVEDI RAVI C ET AL, "The effects of infliximab therapy on the serum proteome of rheumatoid arthritis patients", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH AND THERAPY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20090306), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1186/AR2637, ISSN 1478-6354, page R32, XP021053397 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * * pages 7-10; figure 1; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar2637
 [Y]  - ELEONORA BALLANTI ET AL, "Role of the complement system in rheumatoid arthritis and psoriatic arthritis: Relationship with anti-TNF inhibitors", AUTOIMMUNITY REVIEWS, vol. 10, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.AUTREV.2011.04.012, ISSN 1568-9972, (20110427), pages 617 - 623, (20110427), XP028265673 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autrev.2011.04.012
 [A]  - LEQUERRÉ THIERRY ET AL, "Gene profiling in white blood cells predicts infliximab responsiveness in rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH AND THERAPY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20060703), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1186/AR1924, ISSN 1478-6354, page R105, XP021020585 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar1924
 [Y]  - ELLI KRUITHOF ET AL, "Identification of synovial biomarkers of response to experimental treatment in early-phase clinical trials in spondylarthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 54, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ART.21914, ISSN 0004-3591, (20060601), pages 1795 - 1804, (20060525), XP002662897 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ART.21914
by applicantUS4946778
 EP0126450
 US4499052
 US4717655
    - VAN GESTEL AM; PREVOO MLL; VAN'T HOF MA ET AL., "Development and validation of the European League Against Rheumatism response criteria for rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1996), vol. 39, pages 34 - 40
    - FULWYLER; MCHUGH, METHODS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 33, pages 613 - 629
    - FULTON ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 43, no. 9, pages 1749 - 1756