Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813850 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813850



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
07.07.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
01.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
04.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
02.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 6
02.08.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
02.08.2013 Partial European search report Search / examination 6
19.07.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
10.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Description Search / examination 22
10.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
10.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4