Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2813850


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
19.05.2017 Change - representative
06.04.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.10.2016 Change - representative
21.09.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2016 First examination report
01.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 Change - designated states published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - request for examination published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]