Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2813850 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13305778 EP14729889



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016123992Global Dossier 05.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP13305778 10.06.2013
WO2014EP62035 10.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3008469Global Dossier 31.07.2019B1
EP3008469 20.04.2016A2
Priority number Date
EP13305778 10.06.2013
EP14729889 10.06.2014
WO2014EP62035 10.06.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014198727Global Dossier 05.02.2015A3
WO2014198727 18.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
EP13305778 10.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2813850Global Dossier 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13305778 10.06.2013