Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816318

EP2816318 - Method of and apparatus for enabling transport of physical assets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Van de Poel, Dirk
Zwaluwenlaan 42
2630 Aartselaar / BE
02 / Goemaere, Patrick
Kemphaanlaan 26
2960 Brecht / BE
03 / Jonckheer, Kurt
Hessenstraatje 10 bus 43
2000 Antwerpen / BE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Lindemann, Robert , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Lindemann, Robert , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date13305839.620.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816318
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/00, G06Q10/04, G08G1/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermöglichung des Transports von Sachwerten und Leuten[2014/52]
English:Method of and apparatus for enabling transport of physical assets[2014/52]
French:Procédé et appareil permettant le transport de biens physiques et de passagers[2014/52]
Examination procedure20.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
04.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]FR2703200  (OBADIA ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 28-37 * [I] 2-14;
 [X]US4360875  (BEHNKE ROBERT W) [X] 1-14 * column 9, line 39 - column 11, line 11 *;
 [A]US6356838  (PAUL SUNIL [US]) [A] 1-14 * section 5.7 *;
 [A]FR2908210  (BOUYGUES TELECOM SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 10, lines 13-19 *