Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2836014

EP2836014 - Operating a cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2017/24]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2015/07]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Helmers, Hakon
Alcatel Lucent France
Centre de Villarceaux
91620 Nozay / FR
02 / Baker, Matthew
Alcatel Lucent Telecom Ltd. The Quadrant Stonehill Green
Westlea
Swindon, Wiltshire WI SN5 7DJ / GB
03 / Hu, Teck
Alcatel Lucent USA Inc.
2958 Cortona Dr.
Melbourne, FL 32940 / US
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)Renoult, Adrien
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/24]Renoult, Adrien
Alcatel-Lucent International
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2015/07]Philippaerts, Yannick , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date13306137.408.08.2013
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2836014
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2836014
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/06, // H04W8/26, H04W24/02
[2015/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
Former [2015/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betrieb einer Zelle[2015/07]
English:Operating a cell[2015/07]
French:Faire fonctionner une cellule[2015/07]
Examination procedure03.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2017Fee for grant paid
28.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.08.2013
AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
MT08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
MT08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/34]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/18]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006105771  (IACONO ANA L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-13 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 25,27,29 * * page 4, paragraphs 35,38,39,41-43 * * page 5, paragraphs 50,51 * * page 6, paragraphs 53,54,56,58 * [I] 5-7,14;
 [I]US2005085265  (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 7,8,10 * * page 2, paragraphs 12,13,25 * * page 3, paragraphs 26,31,32 * * page 5, paragraph 40 * * page 6, paragraphs 46-50 * * page 8, paragraph 62 * * page 9, paragraph 71 * * page 10, paragraph 79 * * page 11, paragraphs 81,82 *;
 [A]US6181276  (SCHLEKEWEY JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 19 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 4 * * column 16, lines 7-31 * * column 18, line 59 - column 19, line 6 *