Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2846328

EP2846328 - Method and apparatus of detection of events [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2016  [2016/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Fontaine, Patrick
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs
CS 176 16
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
02 / Laurent, Anthony
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs
CS 176 16
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
03 / Gilberton, Philippe
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs
CS 176 16
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/11]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13306219.005.09.2013
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2846328
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G10L25/51
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Ereignissen[2015/11]
English:Method and apparatus of detection of events[2015/11]
French:Procédé et appareil de détection d'événements[2015/11]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2013Examination requested  [2015/11]
12.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/11]
23.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011102133  (SHAFFER THOMAS [US]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0024] *;
 [XI]  - SHAHRIAR NIRJON ET AL, "Auditeur", PROCEEDING OF THE 11TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE SYSTEMS, APPLICATIONS, AND SERVICES, MOBISYS '13, New York, New York, USA, (20130628), vol. 13, doi:10.1145/2462456.2464446, ISBN 978-1-45-031672-9, page 403, XP055100420 [X] 1,4-6,8-10 * section 2 * * section 6.1.1 * * table 1 * [I] 2,3,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2462456.2464446
 [A]  - YA-TI PENG ET AL, "Healthcare audio event classification using Hidden Markov Models and Hierarchical Hidden Markov Models", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2009. ICME 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), doi:10.1109/ICME.2009.5202720, ISBN 978-1-4244-4290-4, pages 1218 - 1221, XP031510976 [A] 3 * section 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2009.5202720
 [A]  - WEIMIN HUANG ET AL, "Scream detection for home applications", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS (ICIEA), 2010 THE 5TH IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100615), ISBN 978-1-4244-5045-9, pages 2115 - 2120, XP031712099 [A] 7 * section IV.A *
 [A]  - LUTFI ROBERT A ET AL, "Automated detection of alarm sounds", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS FOR THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 132, no. 2, doi:10.1121/1.4734555, ISSN 0001-4966, (20120801), pages EL125 - EL128, (20120712), XP012163207 [A] 2 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.4734555