Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854357

EP2854357 - Method for connecting a first host and a second host within at least one communication network through a relay module, corresponding relay module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2016  [2016/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Le Bolzer, Françoise
TECHNICOLOR
Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs, CS 176 16
35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR
02 / Gouache, Stéphane
TECHNICOLOR
Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs, CS 176 16
35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR
03 / Montalvo, Luis
TECHNICOLOR
Technicolor R&D France
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
ZAC des Champs Blancs, CS 176 16
35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13306349.530.09.2013
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2854357
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, // H04W88/06
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbindung eines ersten Hosts und eines zweiten Hosts in mindestens einem Kommunikationsnetzwerk durch ein Relaismodul, entsprechendes Relaismodul[2015/14]
English:Method for connecting a first host and a second host within at least one communication network through a relay module, corresponding relay module[2015/14]
French:Procédé pour relier un premier hôte et un second hôte dans au moins un réseau de communication à travers un module de relais, module de relais correspondant[2015/14]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2013Examination requested  [2015/14]
02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/14]
17.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013195004  (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * figures 1-5, 7, 8 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0079] * [I] 6-9,12;
 [XI]US2013194963  (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 6-9,12;
 [XI]EP2538637  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * [I] 6-9,12;
 [XI]US2012093150  (KINI SRIGANESH [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050] * [I] 6-9,12;
 [A]US2010281168  (LI QING [US] ET AL) [A] 5 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028]; figures 5, 6 *
 [XI]  - HAMPEL T KLEIN ALCATEL-LUCENT G, "MPTCP Proxies and Anchors; draft-hampel-mptcp-proxies-anchors-00.txt", MPTCP PROXIES AND ANCHORS; DRAFT-HAMPEL-MPTCP-PROXIES-ANCHORS-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20120208), pages 1 - 30, XP015080543 [X] 1-4,6,8-15 * abstract * * Section 2, Section 3, Section 4, Section 5 * [I] 7