EP2887173 - Method and apparatus for DC-DC converter with boost/low dropout (LDO) mode control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mengad, Zakaria Victor Park Terrace Edinburgh, EH128BA / GB | 02 /
Teplechuk, Mykhaylo 22/5 West Savile Terrace Edinburgh, EH93EA / GB | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 13368044.7 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887173 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/56, H02M3/156 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G05F1/56 (EP,US);
G05F1/575 (EP,US);
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
G05F1/59 (EP,US);
G05F1/618 (EP,US);
H02M1/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Gleichstrom-Gleichstromwandler mit Verstärkung/Low-Dropout (LDO) | [2015/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for DC-DC converter with boost/low dropout (LDO) mode control | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour convertisseur CC-CC avec survolteur/faible chute de tension (LDO) | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 30.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011127977 (CHANG CHUN-HUNG [TW], et al) [I] 1,3-8,15-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2007296384 (DOW STEPHEN W [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2009128115 (CHEN CHUNG-KUANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,3,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]US2006033481 (THIELE GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1635239 (DIALOG SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,15,16 * abstract *; | [A] - DRENNAN P G ET AL, "Implications of Proximity Effects for Analog Design", CONFERENCE 2006, IEEE CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060901), doi:10.1109/CICC.2006.320869, ISBN 978-1-4244-0075-1, pages 169 - 176, XP031052445 [A] 4-8,16-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CICC.2006.320869 | by applicant | US8049479 | US7821243 | US6809678 | US6414856 | US4607323 |