Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784304

EP2784304 - Method of operating a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alstom Renovables España, S.L.
C/ Roc Boronat, 78
08005 Barcelona / ES
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Canal Vila, Marc
C/ Bailén, 240, 5º 1ª
08037 BARCELONA / ES
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13382120.727.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784304
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784304
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F03D7/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA01.06.2015
ME01.06.2015
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Windturbine[2014/40]
English:Method of operating a wind turbine[2014/40]
French:Procédé de fonctionnement d'une éolienne[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
02.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2016Fee for grant paid
12.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2015
Opposition(s)01.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2013
AL31.08.2016
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
GB27.03.2017
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL31.08.2016
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
GB27.03.2017
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
GB27.03.2017
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
MT27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
GB27.03.2017
IE27.03.2017
LU27.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU27.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
Former [2018/07]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
FR31.03.2017
Former [2018/01]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/13]AT31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012013195  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]; WEDEL-HEINEN JENS JAKOB [DK]) [X] 1,15 * page 4, line 6 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-6 * * page 9, line 15 - page 13, line 35 * [I] 8-10;
 [I]US2011144815  (NEUMANN ULRICH [US]) [I] 1,8-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [A]WO2013000810  (LM WIND POWER AS [DK]; SLOT MARK OLAF [DK]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 24 - page 20, line 14 *