Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802042

EP2802042 - Thermocouple connector adapted for being connected to a safety gas valve, and thermocouple [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORKLI, S. COOP.
Carretera Zaldibia, s/n
20240 Ordizia (Gipuzkoa) / ES
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Zuriarrain Berasategi, Mikel
Zelata Kalea, 5A
20210 Lazkao / ES
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Igartua, Ismael
Galbaian S.Coop.
Polo de Innovación Garaia
Goiru Kalea 1 - P.O. Box 213
20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13382173.610.05.2013
[2014/46]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802042
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802042
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/17, H01R24/38, H01R13/18, H01R13/193, // H01R4/64, F23N5/10, H01R101/00, H01R103/00
[2017/08]
Former International [2014/46]H01R13/17, H01R24/38, H01R13/18, // H01R4/64, F23N5/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Thermoelementstecker zur Verbindung an ein Sicherheitsgasventil sowie Thermoelement[2014/46]
English:Thermocouple connector adapted for being connected to a safety gas valve, and thermocouple[2014/46]
French:Connecteur de thermocouple conçu pour être relié à une soupape de gaz de sécurité et thermocouple[2014/46]
Examination procedure11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
28.12.2015Observations by third parties
29.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2017Fee for grant paid
31.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2016
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/39]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2013021340  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 9 - page 18; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [Y]US2003082949  (PARRISH JEFFREY DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030]; figures 3,5A-5C,6 *;
 [Y]GB2447648  (CLIFF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS LTD [GB]) [Y] 3-8 * figure 2 *;
 [YDA]EP2182584  (ORKLI S COOP LTDA [ES]) [YD] 9-11 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 * [A] 1
ExaminationWO2012001716
by applicantEP0619460
 EP2182584