Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2802042 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2802042



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 197
16.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
07.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
07.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 2
02.02.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 23
28.12.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
28.12.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
11.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
11.05.2015 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
02.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
23.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 Description Search / examination 8
23.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
23.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
10.05.2013 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15