Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2802042 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410226230 EP13382173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9350117Global Dossier 24.05.2016B2
US2014335718 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104466522BGlobal Dossier 10.04.2018B
CN104466522 25.03.2015A
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2802042Global Dossier 12.07.2017B1
EP2802042 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR096155 09.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR102014010857 26.06.2018A2
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2653167 07.05.2018C2
RU2014118220 20.11.2015A
Priority number Date
EP13382173 10.05.2013