Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816030

EP2816030 - Process for the preparation of frovatriptan and its enantiomer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.2015  [2015/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duke Chem, S. A.
Av. Mare de Deu de Monserrat, 93-99 Pol. Ind. Sant Pere Molanta
08799 Olerdola Barcelona / ES
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Silva Guisasola, Octavio
C/ Raso del Portillo, 47
47162 ALDEAMAYOR DE SAN MARTÍN / ES
02 / Esteve Casol, Judit
Duke Chem, S. A.
Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 93-99, Pol. Ind.
Sant Pere Molanta
08799 OLÈRDOLA (Barcelona) / ES
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13382233.820.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816030
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/88
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Frovatriptan und dessen Enantiomer[2014/52]
English:Process for the preparation of frovatriptan and its enantiomer[2014/52]
French:Procédés de préparation de frovatriptan et ses énantiomères[2014/52]
Examination procedure20.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/53]
03.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/53]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9414772  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]; BORRETT GARY THOMAS [GB]; KITTERINGHAM JO) [AD] 1-15 * examples 3,13 *;
 [AD]WO2012147020  (ORCHID CHEMICALS AND PHARAMCEUTICALS LTD [IN]; REGURI BUCHI REDDY [IN]) [AD] 1-15 * Page 8, lines14-23; page 9, lines 19-23 *;
 [A]WO2010043571  (INTERQUIM SA [ES]; MARQUILLAS OLONDRIZ FRANCISCO [ES]; POMARES MARCO M) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *
by applicantWO9300086
 WO9414772
 WO2012147020
 WO9954302