Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2816030 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2816030



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 52
24.11.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 1
13.11.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
20.06.2013 Description Search / examination 24
20.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4