Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2816030


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.11.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
05.08.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.08.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]