Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822325

EP2822325 - Method, system and computer-readable storage mediums for estimating a route [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.2015  [2015/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonica Digital España, S.L.U.
Gran Via 28
28013 Madrid / ES
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Kwak, Haewoon
TELEFONICA DIGITAL ESPAÑA, SLU
Gran Via 28
Madrid / ES
02 / Frias Martinez, Enrique
TELEFONICA DIGITAL ESPAÑA SLU
Gran Via 28
Madrid / ES
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Gonzalez-Alberto Rodriguez, Natalia
GARRIGUES IP, S.L.P. Hermosilla, 3
28001 Madrid / ES
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13382266.803.07.2013
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822325
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W40/20, G01C21/34, G01S5/00, H04W4/02, H04W40/24, H04W64/00
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren, System und computerlesbares Speichermedien zur Schätzung einer Route[2015/02]
English:Method, system and computer-readable storage mediums for estimating a route[2015/02]
French:Procédé, système et supports de stockage lisibles par ordinateur pour estimer un itinéraire[2015/02]
Examination procedure03.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/02]
08.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/53]
13.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/53]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2008053208  (TRISENT COMM LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2012019246  (SEEKER WIRELESS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0147] *
 [I]  - HAO TIAN ET AL, "A novel approach to estimate human space-time path based on mobile phone call records", GEOINFORMATICS, 2010 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100618), ISBN 978-1-4244-7301-4, pages 1 - 6, XP031750167 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1437013
 US2012115475
    - O. GORNERUP, "Scalable mining of common routes in mobile communication network traffic data. In Proceedings of the 10th international conference on Pervasive Computing", PERVASIVE'12, (2012), pages 99 - 106,
    - R. A. BECKER; R. CACERES; K. HANSON; J. M. LOH; S. URBANEK; A. VARSHAVSKY; C. VOLINSKY, "Route classification using cellular handoff patterns. In Proceedings of the 13th international conference on Ubiquitous computing", UBICOMP '11, (2011), pages 123 - 132,