Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790402

EP2790402 - Image magnifying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SELVAS Healthcare, Inc.
1F, 174, Gajeong-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon / KR
[2017/06]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
JAWON MEDICAL CO., LTD.
174, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon
34114 / KR
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
HIMS International Corp.
139-9, Gajung-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-350 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yang Taik, Yoon
Hims International Corp.
515-605, Sindong Pamillie, Gwanpyeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
305-745 Daejeon / KR
02 / Kyeong Seon, Choi
Hims International Corp.
510-1604, Songnimmaeul Apt.
Hagi-dong
Yuseong-gu
305-759 Daejeon / KR
03 / Sang Jun, Lee
Hims International Corp.
901-1201, Gubongmaeul 9-danji
Gwanjeo 2(i)-dong
Seo-gu
302-903 Daejeon / KR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Pizzoli, Antonio , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti SpA
Via G. Carducci 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria
IPAMARK, S.L.
Paseo de la Castellana 72 1°
28046 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date13382277.505.07.2013
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateKR2013003837209.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130038372
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790402
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/74, H04N5/225
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildvergrösserungsvorrichtung[2014/42]
English:Image magnifying apparatus[2014/42]
French:Appareil d'agrandissement d'image[2014/42]
Examination procedure03.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
14.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2000138856  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0023] , [0024] , [0041] , [0045] , [0047] , [0049] - [0051] - [0055]; figures 2,6,7; claim 7 *;
 [I]EP1427194  (NEC VIEWTECHNOLOGY LTD [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0027] , [0034] - [0036] - [0038] , [0044] , [0064]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2005122553  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]; UCHIGASHIMA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 2a-2e *;
 [A]US4945367  (BLACKSHEAR DAVID M [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *