Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2849294

EP2849294 - A Tunable Laser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/12]A tunable laser, a method for making, and a method for operating such a laser
[2019/31]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - German titlepublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - English titlepublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - French titlepublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpes Lasers S.A.
Avenue des Pâquiers 1
2072 St-Blaise / CH
[2017/29]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Alpes Lasers S.A.
Passage Maximilien-de-Meuron 1-3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Bismuto, Alfredo
Rue des Fahys 73
2000 Neuchatel / CH
02 / Wolf, Johanna
Lorenstrasse 74
8053 Zürich / CH
03 / Müller, Antoine
Rue Champréveyres 2
2000 Neuchatel / CH
04 / Faist, Jérôme
Felsenrainstrasse 80
8052 Zürich / CH
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Barth, Carl Otto
ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth Zürichstrasse 34
8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date13405109.313.09.2013
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2849294
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2849294
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/06, H01S5/024, H01S5/042, H01S5/227, // H01S5/026, H01S5/0625, H01S5/22, H01S5/32, H01S5/34, H01S5/40
[2019/03]
Former International [2015/12]H01S5/024, H01S5/06, H01S5/227, H01S5/062, // H01S5/042, H01S5/0625, H01S5/22, H01S5/32, H01S5/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Former [2015/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Abstimmbarer Laser[2019/31]
English:A Tunable Laser[2019/31]
French:Laser accordable[2019/31]
Former [2015/12]Abstimmbarer Laser, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verfahren zum Betrieb solch eines Lasers
Former [2015/12]A tunable laser, a method for making, and a method for operating such a laser
Former [2015/12]Laser accordable, procédé de fabrication et procédé pour faire fonctionner un tel laser
Examination procedure16.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
16.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2019Fee for grant paid
05.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5341391  (ISHIMURA EITARO [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,14 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-4,7,9-11 * * column 5, line 14 - column 9, line 65 * [Y] 12,13,15 [I] 7,9-13,15;
 [XYI]US2002090011  (PEZESHKI BARDIA [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0040]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 12,13,15 [I] 7,9,10
Examination   - NELSON D D ET AL, "Spectral characterization of a near-room temperature continuous wave quantum cascade laser for nitric oxide detection at 5.5 Î 1/4 m", TECHNICAL DIGEST CD-ROM / CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS, QUANTUM ELECTRONICS AND LASER SCIENCE CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE ON PHOTONIC APPLICATIONS, SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES : LONG BEACH CONVENTION CENTER, LONG BEACH, CALIFORNIA, USA ; CLEO/QELS, (20060521), ISBN 978-1-55752-813-1, pages 1 - 2, XP031393845
by applicantUS7944959
 US8290011