Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816424

EP2816424 - Method and apparatus for controlling an industrial process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gefran S.p.A.
Via Sebina, 74
25050 Provaglio d'Iseo (Brescia) / IT
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Chinello, Adriano
Via Godio e Pirovano, 10
I-28041 Arona, Novara / IT
02 / Rosa, Stefano
Via Zonta, 9
I-25013 Carpenedolo, Brescia / IT
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Mozzi, Matteo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13425086.920.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816424
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042, G05B19/05
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines industriellen Prozesses[2014/52]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling an industrial process[2014/52]
French:Procédé et système de contrôle d'un procédé industriel[2014/52]
Examination procedure20.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
05.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013090745  (FRAZER MARK J [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11,14-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0050] - [0066] - [0103] - [0120] - [0137] * [I] 4,5,9,12,13;
 [A]US4870614  (QUATSE JESSE T [US]) [A] 1,11-13,18 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 9 *;
 [A]US2011077749  (SHANG WEIHUA [CN] ET AL) [A] 1,18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0056] * * abstract *;
 [A]US2004133285  (FISCHBACH GUNTHER [DE] ET AL) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *