blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2700310 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2700310



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 552
18.10.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
25.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
07.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
07.09.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
07.09.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
30.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
30.08.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
30.08.2016 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.08.2016 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
30.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
07.06.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
20.05.2016 Description Search / examination 24
20.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.05.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax Search / examination 26
15.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
15.03.2016 Description Search / examination 22
15.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.08.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 17
12.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2015 Description Search / examination 18
12.08.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
04.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2015 Description Search / examination 17
04.08.2015 Description Search / examination 18
04.08.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.04.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.04.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
09.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.08.2014 Description Search / examination 10
09.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
05.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
05.08.2014 Description Search / examination 22
05.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.03.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.02.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
29.01.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
29.01.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.01.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
11.10.2013 Annex Search / examination 2
11.10.2013 Request for a decision Search / examination 2
29.09.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Request for a decision Search / examination 2
14.09.2013 Cover letter for submission of priority search results Search / examination 1
14.09.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 2
12.09.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of filing/search fee) Search / examination 2
10.09.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
05.09.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
05.09.2013 Description Search / examination 21
05.09.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Priority document Search / examination 27
01.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
01.07.2013 General authorisation Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
01.07.2013 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 27