blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2700310


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019 [2019/46]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
20.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
11.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.09.2016 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.09.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
06.09.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.06.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.06.2016 Change - inventor
22.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2016 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2016 Change - first examination report published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
04.05.2016 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2016 Deletion: Reply to examination report
15.03.2016 Change: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.08.2015 Change: Reply to examination report
21.08.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.04.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.04.2015 First examination report
22.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2014 Request for examination filed published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
25.02.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
28.10.2013 New entry: Request for decision: result
28.09.2013 New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request
11.09.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit