blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2700310
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2700310Global Dossier 14.12.2016B1
EP2700310 26.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
PL39973612 01.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL226089B 30.06.2017B1
PL399736 07.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
PL39973612 01.07.2012