Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2700310

EP2700310 - Preservatives for protection against fungi and algae and methods of wood protection against fungi and algae using those preservatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Instytut Technologii Drewna
ul. Winiarska 1
60-654 Poznan / PL
[2014/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Zabielska-Matejuk, Jadwiga
ul. Jagodowa 27
62-002 Suchy Las / PL
02 / Pernak, Juliusz
ul. Nalkowskiej 8a
60-573 Poznan / PL
03 / Fojutowski, Andrzej
ul. Poziomkowa 6
62-070 Paledzie / PL
04 / KOT, Mariusz
Os.Zwyciestwa 15/143
61-647 Poznan / PL
05 / Stangierska, Anna
Os.Czecha 103/8
61-290 Poznan / PL
06 / Przybylska, Weronika
ul.Mickiewicza 1/2
64-330 Opalenica / PL
 [2016/50]
Former [2014/09]01 / Zabielska-Matejuk, Jadwiga
ul. Jagodowa 27
62-002 Suchy Las / PL
02 / Pernak, Juliusz
ul. Na?kowskiej 8a
60-573 Pozna? / PL
03 / Fojutowski, Andrzej
ul. Poziomkowa 6
62-070 Pal?dzie / PL
04 / KOT, Mariusz
Os.Zwyci?stwa 15/143
61-647 Pozna? / PL
05 / Stangierska, Anna
Os.Czecha 103/8
61-290 Pozna? / PL
06 / Przybylska, Weronika
ul.Mickiewicza 1/2
64-330 Opalenica / PL
Representative(s)Piatkowska, Elzbieta
Kancelaria Patentowa
Skorzewo, ul. Truskawkowa 12
60-185 Poznan / PL
[2014/09]
Application number, filing date13460046.901.07.2013
[2014/09]
Priority number, datePL2012039973601.07.2012         Original published format: PL 39973612
[2014/09]
Filing languagePL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2700310
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2700310
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01N33/12, A01N43/653, A01P3/00, A01P13/00, B27K3/00
[2014/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/09]
TitleGerman:Konservierungsmittel zum Schutz gegen Pilze und Algen und Verfahren zum Holzschutz gegen Pilze und Algen unter Verwendung dieser Konservierungsmittel[2014/09]
English:Preservatives for protection against fungi and algae and methods of wood protection against fungi and algae using those preservatives[2014/09]
French:Conservateurs pour la protection contre des champignons et des algues et procédés permettant de protéger le bois contre des champignons et des algues utilisant ces conservateurs[2014/09]
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/09]
12.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/09]
26.09.2013Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
28.10.2013Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
25.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/16]
05.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2016Fee for grant paid
25.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2015
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.07.2013
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
IE01.07.2017
LU01.07.2017
MT01.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
IE01.07.2017
LU01.07.2017
MT01.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
IE01.07.2017
LU01.07.2017
MT01.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/34]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
IE01.07.2017
LU01.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2011161404  (ARCH TIMBER PROT LTD [GB]; MARS CRAIG ANDREW [GB]; CANTRELL DAVID GRIN) [I] 1-3,8-20 * claims 1,10,12,19,21 *;
 [I]WO2005058238  (MICROBAN PRODUCTS [US]; PAYNE STEPHEN A [US]) [I] 1-3,8-20 * examples 1-6 *;
 [A]PL379415  (INST TECH DREWNA [PL]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0533017  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP2036435  (REMMERS BAUSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1,2 *
 [A]  - Andrzej Fojutowski ET AL, "THE ASSESSMENT OF MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF WOOD TREATED WITH IONIC LIQUIDS", Drewno. Pr. Nauk. Donies. Komunik., (20100101), URL: http://yadda.icm.edu.pl/yadda/element/bwmeta1.element.baztech-article-BAT8-0017-0027/c/httpwww_bg_utp_edu_plartd20nr20184drewnovol53nr184a_fojutowskia_noskowiakm_kota_kropacza_stangierska.pdf, (20140103), XP055094714 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Iwona Frackowiak ET AL, "APPLICATION OF AMMONIUM IONIC LIQUIDS IN PARTICLEBOARD TECHNOLOGY", Drewno. Pr. Nauk. Donies. Komunik, (20100101), URL: http://yadda.icm.edu.pl/yadda/element/bwmeta1.element.dl-catalog-65b07956-fc9a-4af7-bab4-f12ca4c71780/c/download.pdf, (20140103), XP055094715 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicantPL166934B
 PL208336
 PL208335
 PL393431
 PL395817
    - WA?NY J.; THORNTON 1.D., "Comparative testing of strains of the dry rot fungus Serpula lacrymans (Schum. ex Fr.) S.F. Gray II. The action of some wood preservatives in agar media", HOLZFORSCHUNG, (1986), vol. 40, pages 383 - 388