Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2700311

EP2700311 - A method of protecting plywood against fungi [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Instytut Technologii Drewna
ul. Winiarska 1
60-654 Poznan / PL
[2014/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Zabielska-Matejuk, Jadwiga
ul.Jagodowa 27
62-002 Suchy Las / PL
02 / Pernak, Juliusz
ul.Nalkowskiej 8a
60-573 Poznan / PL
03 / Józwiak, Mariusz
ul.Wierzbiecice 35/8
61-558 Poznan / PL
04 / Kot, Mariusz
Os.Zwyciestwa 15/143
61-647 Poznan / PL
 [2017/15]
Former [2014/09]01 / Zabielska-Matejuk, Jadwiga
ul.Jagodowa 27
62-002 Suchy Las / PL
02 / Pernak, Juliusz
ul.Nalkowskiej 8a
60-573 Poznan / PL
03 / JozWiak, Mariusz
ul.Wierzbiecice 35/8
61-558 Poznan / PL
04 / Kot, Mariusz
Os.Zwyciestwa 15/143
61-647 Poznan / PL
Representative(s)Piatkowska, Elzbieta
Kancelaria Patentowa
Skorzewo, ul. Truskawkowa 12
60-185 Poznan / PL
[2014/09]
Application number, filing date13460047.722.07.2013
[2014/09]
Priority number, datePL2012040010323.07.2012         Original published format: PL 40010312
[2014/09]
Filing languagePL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2700311
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2700311
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01N33/12, A01N43/653, C08L97/02
[2017/01]
Former International [2014/09]A01N33/12, A01N43/653, B27K3/36, B27K3/50, C08L97/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Schutz von Sperrholz gegen Pilze[2014/09]
English:A method of protecting plywood against fungi[2014/09]
French:Procédé pour protéger le contreplaqué contre les champignons[2017/01]
Former [2014/09]Procédé de protection contre les champignons de contre-plaqué
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/09]
30.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/09]
13.11.2013Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
20.11.2013Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
25.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
21.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2017Fee for grant paid
16.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2015
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
03.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2013
AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IE22.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0781637  (UPM KYMMENE OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 2, line 32 - line 36; example - * * page 5, line 14 - line 18 *;
 [Y]EP0533017  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-25 * column 2, line 40 - line 42 * * column 3, line 3 - line 46 * * column 4, line 47 - line 56 *;
 [Y]WO2006118980  (CHEMICAL SPECIALTIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]PL379415  (INST TECH DREWNA [PL]) [Y] 1-25 * page 2 *;
 [Y]PL393431  (INST TECH DREWNA [PL]) [Y] 1-25 * example - *
 [X]  - Iwona Frackowiak ET AL, "APPLICATION OF AMMONIUM IONIC LIQUIDS IN PARTICLEBOARD TECHNOLOGY", Drewno. Pr. Nauk. Donies. Komunik, (20100101), URL: http://yadda.icm.edu.pl/yadda/element/bwmeta1.element.dl-catalog-65b07956-fc9a-4af7-bab4-f12ca4c71780/c/download.pdf, (20140103), XP055094715 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
Examination   - Andrzej Fojutowski ET AL, "THE ASSESSMENT OF MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF WOOD TREATED WITH IONIC LIQUIDS", Drewno. Pr. Nauk. Donies. Komunik., (20100101), URL: http://yadda.icm.edu.pl/yadda/element/bwmeta1.element.baztech-article-BAT8-0017-0027/c/httpwww_bg_utp_edu_plartd20nr20184drewnovol53nr184a_fojutowskia_noskowiakm_kota_kropacza_stangierska.pdf, (20140103), XP055094714
by applicantUS6444329
 US6818317
    - TERZI E.; KARTAL S.; WHITE R; SHINODA K.; IMAMURA Y., EUR. J. WOOD PROD., (2011), pages 41 - 51,
    - Construction wood protection with chemical agents against biological corrosion. Requirements and tests, BUILDING RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (1998), pages 1 - 27,