Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830072

EP2830072 - An electrical lead through connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.01.2016  [2016/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Florkowski, Marek
ul.Zdrowa 18/5
31-216 Krakow / PL
02 / Piasecki, Wojciech
Friedleina 28A/28
30-611 Krakow / PL
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Chochorowska-Winiarska, Krystyna
ABB Sp. z o. o.
ul. Zeganska 1
04-713 Warszawa / PL
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Chochorowska-Winiarska, Krystyna
ABB Sp. z o. o.
Ul. Zeganska 1
04-713 Warszawa / PL
Application number, filing date13460049.324.07.2013
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830072
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/34, H02G15/20, // H01B17/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrische Leitung durch Verbinder[2015/05]
English:An electrical lead through connector[2015/05]
French:Fil électrique à travers un connecteur[2015/05]
Examination procedure24.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/04]
08.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2605255  (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4205290  (CANNEY ROBERT S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * figures 2-5; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US2007089896  (STEPNIAK FRANK M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2514634  (KUHN ERNST DR) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *
 [YD]  - MIETEK GLINKOWSKI ET AL, "SmartChoke - protecting power equipment from fast transients", TRANSMISSION AND DISTRIBUTION CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2008. T&D. IEEE/PES, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080421), ISBN 978-1-4244-1903-6, pages 1 - 7, XP031250074 [YD] 1-6 * page 1 - page 3 *