Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886276

EP2886276 - Method of wood surface against light and agent for implementation of this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Instytut Technologii Drewna
ul. Winiarska 1
60-654 Poznan / PL
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Nowaczyk-Organista, Magdalena
Os. Piastowskie 43/25;
61-153 / PL
02 / Oleszek, Tomasz
ul. Pozna?ska 16A/38;
62-028 Kozieg?owy / PL
03 / PR?DZY?SKI, W?odzimierz
ul. Zakopia?ska 210a;
60-467 Pozna? / PL
04 / Krzoska-Adamczak, Zofia
Os. Armii Krajowej 38/ 5;
61-376 Pozna? / PL
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Piatkowska, Elzbieta
Kancelaria Patentowa
Skorzewo, ul. Truskawkowa 12
60-185 Poznan / PL
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date13460085.719.12.2013
[2015/26]
Filing languagePL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886276
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B27K3/16, B05D7/08, C09D7/12, C09D5/32, // C08K3/00, C08K3/22
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren für eine Holzoberfläche gegen Licht und Mittel zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[2015/26]
English:Method of wood surface against light and agent for implementation of this method[2015/26]
French:Procédé de surface en bois contre la lumière et agent de mise en ouvre de ce procédé[2015/26]
Examination procedure31.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/26]
18.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Divisional application(s)EP15001456.1  / EP2957404
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
04.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4883689  (GRADEFF PETER S [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1, 4, 11, 13-14 * [I] 2-6;
 [XAI]US2002022682  (WALLACE PENNY JO [US], et al) [X] 7,11,12 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23] , [0 64] * [A] 1,8-10,14-16 [I] 13,17,18;
 [I]DE102004027075  (SE MA GES FUER INNOVATIONEN MB [DE]) [I] 19-25 * examples 1-2; claims 1, 3 *