Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2866446

EP2866446 - Method and multi-camera portable device for producing stereo images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lateral Reality Kft.
Budafoki ut. 91-93
1117 Budapest / HU
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Torma, Péter
Csillagerdö u. 13.
H-2072 Zsámbék / HU
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Harangozo, Gabor
Danubia
Patent & Law Office LLC
P.O. Box 198
1368 Budapest / HU
[2015/18]
Application number, filing date13462006.128.10.2013
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2866446
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2866446
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/02
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Former [2015/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und tragbare Multi-Kamera-Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Stereobildern[2015/18]
English:Method and multi-camera portable device for producing stereo images[2015/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif portable multicaméra pour produire des images stéréo[2015/18]
Examination procedure25.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
18.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2016Fee for grant paid
25.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2016
Opposition(s)07.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.10.2013
AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IE28.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU28.10.2013
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IE28.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2018/32]HU28.10.2013
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IE28.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU28.10.2013
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IE28.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IE28.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/45]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
LU28.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT06.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013135445  (DAHI BAHRAM [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0095] *;
 [A]US2012026298  (FILO ANDREW S [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1A-4B *;
 [A]US2011001793  (MORIYAMA TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-33 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0278] *;
 [A]US2012098938  (JIN ELAINE W [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]  - WU H H P ET AL, "Epipolar geometry of catadioptric stereo systems with planar mirrors", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 27, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.IMAVIS.2008.09.007, ISSN 0262-8856, (20090702), pages 1047 - 1061, (20081002), XP026157397 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.imavis.2008.09.007
by applicantUS8189100
    - J. GLUCKMAN; S.K. NAYAR, "Catadioptric Stereo Using Planar Mirrors", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON COMPUTER VISION, (200108), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 65 - 79