EP2802944 - WATCH MOVEMENT COMPRISING A TOURBILLON FOR A CHRONOGRAPH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lvmh Swiss Manufactures SA Rue L.-J. Chevrolet 6a 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMON, Guy Rue de l'Evole 83 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13700145.9 | 08.01.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013EP50239 | Priority number, date | CH20120003812 | 10.01.2012 Original published format: CH 38122012 | CH20120031812 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: CH 318122012 | [2014/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013104634 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802944 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802944 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/28, G04F7/08 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G04B1/12 (EP);
G04B17/285 (EP);
G04F7/0866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHRWERK MIT TOURBILLON FÜR EINEN CHRONOGRAF | [2014/47] | English: | WATCH MOVEMENT COMPRISING A TOURBILLON FOR A CHRONOGRAPH | [2014/47] | French: | MOUVEMENT DE MONTRE A TOURBILLON POUR CHRONOGRAPHE | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 12.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2013 | AL | 15.06.2016 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | IE | 08.01.2017 | LU | 08.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.01.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 08.01.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 08.01.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.01.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB190606858 (DOUGLAS WILLIAM HENRY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]CH697529 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0004] * | by applicant | EP1738230 | CH697523 | CH697529 | EP1706796 | GB190606858 | WO03065130 | EP0335054 |