Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803036

EP2803036 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING A SUPER-RESOLUTION VERSION OF A LOW RESOLUTION INPUT DATA STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SALVADOR, Jordi
c/o Deutsche Thomson OHG
Research & Innovation
Karl-Wiechert-Alleee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
02 / KOCHALE, Axel
c/o Deutsche Thomson OHG
Research & Innovation
Karl-Wiechert-Alleee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
03 / BORSUM, Malte
c/o Deutsche Thomson OHG
Research & Innovation
Karl-Wiechert-Alleee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]König, Uwe , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date13700174.911.01.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013EP50466
Priority number, dateEP2012030504612.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12305046
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104747
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803036
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803036
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/40
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER HOCHAUFGELÖSTEN VERSION EINER EINGABEDATENSTRUKTUR MIT GERINGER AUFLÖSUNG[2014/47]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING A SUPER-RESOLUTION VERSION OF A LOW RESOLUTION INPUT DATA STRUCTURE[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE GÉNÉRER UNE VERSION SUPER RÉSOLUTION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES D'ENTRÉE BASSE RÉSOLUTION[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2015Fee for grant paid
25.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2015
Opposition(s)05.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.01.2013
AL04.11.2015
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU11.01.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/38]HU11.01.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU11.01.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.01.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE11.01.2016
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
LU11.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
LU11.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/46]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
LU11.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/42]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
LU11.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
LU11.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010122502  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]; IRANI MICHAL [IL]; GLASSNER DANIEL [IL]; SHAHAR O) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0098]; figure 4 *;
 [A]  - JUEPING BIAN ET AL, "Improved SAI method using non-local spatial constraint for image interpolation", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (WCSP), 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111109), doi:10.1109/WCSP.2011.6096772, ISBN 978-1-4577-1009-4, pages 1 - 4, XP032100974 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCSP.2011.6096772
 [A]  - HAICHAO ZHANG ET AL, "Multi-scale Non-Local Kernel Regression for super resolution", IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), 2011 18TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110911), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2011.6115688, ISBN 978-1-4577-1304-0, pages 1353 - 1356, XP032079840 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2011.6115688
 [IP]  - JORDI SALVADOR ET AL, "Robust super-resolution for interactive video navigation", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS - BERLIN (ICCE-BERLIN), 2012 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120903), doi:10.1109/ICCE-BERLIN.2012.6336528, ISBN 978-1-4673-1546-3, pages 333 - 334, XP032256569 [IP] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE-Berlin.2012.6336528
 [AP]  - SHAHRYAR SHAFIQUE QURESHI ET AL, "Investigating image super resolution techniques: What to choose?", ADVANCED COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY (ICACT), 2012 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120219), ISBN 978-1-4673-0150-3, pages 642 - 647, XP032153188 [AP] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [T]  - JORDI SALVADOR ET AL, "Patch-based spatio-temporal super-resolution for video with non-rigid motion", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (20130301), doi:10.1016/j.image.2013.02.002, ISSN 0923-5965, XP055059300 [T] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2013.02.002
by applicantWO2010122502
    - G. FREEDMAN; R. FATTAL, IMAGE AND VIDEO UPSCALING FROM LOCAL SELF-EXAMPLES