Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802733

EP2802733 - MULTIPLE RAMP COMPRESSION PACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[2015/50]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Blvd.
Houston, TX 77072 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ACOSTA, Frank, V.
1408 Wisteria Ave.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
02 / DUKE, Wesley, G.
2913 W. Walnut St.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
03 / YATES, Stoney, M.
1201 Woodlawn Ave.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
04 / KEY, John
RR 2. Box 551
Comanche, OK 73529 / US
05 / BUDLER, Nicholas
2827 Cottonwood Walk Ct.
Spring, TX 77388 / US
 [2015/50]
Former [2014/47]01 / ACOSTA, Frank, V.
1408 Wisteria Ave.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
02 / DUKE, Wesley, G.
2913 W. Walnut St.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
03 / YATES, Stoney, M.
1201 Woodlawn Ave.
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
04 / KEY, John
RR 2. Box 551
Comanche, OK 73529 / US
05 / BUDLER, Nicholas
2110 N. Mile Road
Marlow, OK 73055 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13700242.403.01.2013
[2015/50]
WO2013US20082
Priority number, dateUS20121335003013.01.2012         Original published format: US201213350030
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013106228
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2802733
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802733
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/06, E21B34/14
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPRESSIONSVERPACKER MIT MEHREREN RAMPEN[2014/47]
English:MULTIPLE RAMP COMPRESSION PACKER[2014/47]
French:GARNITURE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À PRESSION À RAMPES MULTIPLES[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
04.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2015Fee for grant paid
12.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15185016.1  / EP3012398
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2015
Opposition(s)12.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.01.2013
AL09.12.2015
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
TR09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU03.01.2013
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
TR09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU03.01.2013
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
BG09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU03.01.2013
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CY09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU03.01.2013
AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
HR09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MK09.12.2015
MT09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2017/47]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
MT09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
IE03.01.2016
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.12.2015
BE09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
LU03.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2016/49]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
PL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SI09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
LU03.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2016/46]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
DK09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
LU03.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
DE02.08.2016
Former [2016/42]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
MC09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
LU03.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
Former [2016/39]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
LU03.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
SM09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
IS09.04.2016
PT11.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.12.2015
CZ09.12.2015
EE09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
IT09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RO09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
SK09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ09.12.2015
ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/31]ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
IS09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/26]ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
NL09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/25]ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
LV09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/24]ES09.12.2015
FI09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
GR10.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
RS09.12.2015
SE09.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES09.12.2015
LT09.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2925865  (NORMAN OLIVER OWEN) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 3, paragraph 3 * * column 3, paragraph 1 * * figures 4,6 *;
 [Y]US2715444  (FEWEL KENNETH J) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US3000443  (THOMPSON ARCHIE E) [Y] 2-14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *