Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802993

EP2802993 - NON-ALLOCATING MEMORY ACCESS WITH PHYSICAL ADDRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / PLONDKE, Erich, James
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / INGLE, Ajay, Anant
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / CODRESCU, Lucian
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13700444.610.01.2013
WO2013US21050
Priority number, dateUS201261584964P10.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584964 P
US20121339892717.02.2012         Original published format: US201213398927
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106583
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802993
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/10, G06F9/30, G06F12/08
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERZUGRIFF OHNE ZUWEISUNG MIT PHYSIKALISCHER ADRESSE[2014/47]
English:NON-ALLOCATING MEMORY ACCESS WITH PHYSICAL ADDRESS[2014/47]
French:ACCÈS À LA MÉMOIRE SANS ALLOCATION, AVEC UNE ADRESSE PHYSIQUE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
10.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5307477  (TAYLOR GEORGE S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,8-11,19,20,23 * column 4, line 67 - column 7, line 17; figures 1-7 * * column 9, line 17 - column 13, line 29 * [I] 2-7,12-18,21,22;
 [XY]US2007198804  (MOYER WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,8-11,18-20,23 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0036] * [Y] 2-7,12-17,21,22;
 [Y]US2009100232  (MOMOSE SHINTARO [JP]) [Y] 2-7,12-17,21,22 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0073] *;
 [Y]US2006112234  (CABOT MASON B [US] ET AL) [Y] 2-7,12-17,21,22 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-5 *