Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2943350

EP2943350 - METHOD OF REFURBISHING ROTOGRAVURE CYLINDERS, ROTOGRAVURE CYLINDERS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paramount International Services Ltd
Trust Company Complex
Ajeltake road
96 960 Majuro / MH
[2016/16]
Former [2015/47]For all designated states
Meton Gravure Technologies, Ltd.
Batchworth House
Batchworth Place
Church Street
Rickmansworth
Hertfordshire WD3 1JE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / IOANNOU, Ioannis
Harilaou Trikoupi 46
GR-145 74 Rodopoli Attikis / GR
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date13700516.108.01.2013
[2015/47]
WO2013EP50228
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014108172
Date:17.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2943350
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2943350
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:B41N3/00, B41N1/20
[2015/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERNEUERUNG VON TIEFDRUCKZYLINDERN, TIEFDRUCKZYLINDER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2015/47]
English:METHOD OF REFURBISHING ROTOGRAVURE CYLINDERS, ROTOGRAVURE CYLINDERS AND THEIR USE[2015/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REMISE À NEUF DE CYLINDRES DE ROTOGRAVURE, CYLINDRES DE ROTOGRAVURE ET LEUR UTILISATION[2015/47]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2015National basic fee paid 
02.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
07.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2018Fee for grant paid
15.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.02.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201705   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2017
31.01.201806   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAI]FR886580  (ELMORES METALL AKTIEN GES) [X] 12,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-11 [I] 14,15;
 [IDA]US2011083570  (BHULLAR RAGHBIR [CA], et al) [ID] 14 * paragraph [0061] * [A] 1-13,15;
 [A]US2117722  (HUGGINS OWEN R) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2011083570
 WO2011073695
 US4334966
 US4781801
 US5417841
 US7153408