Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806748

EP2806748 - LIQUID TEA COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[2015/49]
Former [2014/49]For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever Plc.
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Alistair, David
Unilever R&D Colworth
Sharnbrook
Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB
02 / WIX, Loyd
Unilever R&D Colworth
Sharnbrook
Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB
03 / ZHANG, Shi, Qiu
Conopco Inc. d/b/a UNILEVER
800 Sylvan Avenue
Englewood Cliffs, New Jersey 07632 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Askew, Sarah Elizabeth
Unilever PLC
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[2015/49]
Former [2014/49]Askew, Sarah Elizabeth
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date13700577.318.01.2013
[2015/49]
WO2013EP50906
Priority number, dateEP2012015282127.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152821
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110550
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806748
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806748
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23F3/14, A23F3/16, A23F3/18
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGE TEEZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/49]
English:LIQUID TEA COMPOSITION[2014/49]
French:COMPOSITION DE THÉ LIQUIDE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2015Fee for grant paid
07.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2015
Opposition(s)05.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.01.2013
AL02.12.2015
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
BG02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU18.01.2013
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
BG02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2018/31]HU18.01.2013
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.01.2013
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/47]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
IE18.01.2016
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
LU18.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
LU18.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
LU18.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/42]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
LU18.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/39]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
LU18.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/31]AT02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/23]LT02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT02.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP2082651  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,11,12 [A] 4-7 [I] 8,10,13-15;
 [A]WO2004037015  (NEW SUN NUTRITION COMPANY [US]; LINES THOMAS CHRISTIAN [LU]; ONO MITSU) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2009059927  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER HINDUSTAN [IN]; COLLIVER) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *