Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803142

EP2803142 - MODULAR DATA SYSTEM HAVING INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOLZ, Peter
Masch 2
32683 Barntrup / DE
02 / KALHOFF, Johannes
Waldstraße 24a
32825 Blomberg / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/47]Blumbach Zinngrebe
Patentanwälte
Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date13700674.811.01.2013
[2019/32]
WO2013EP50493
Priority number, dateDE2012100040912.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012000409
[2014/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104758
Date:18.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803142
Date:19.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803142
Date:07.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B5/00, H02J5/00, H04L12/10, H04L25/02, H02J7/02
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODULARES DATENSYSTEM MIT INDUKTIVER ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG[2014/47]
English:MODULAR DATA SYSTEM HAVING INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSFER[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈME DE DONNÉES MODULAIRE AVEC TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE PAR INDUCTION[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014National basic fee paid 
11.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
07.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2019Fee for grant paid
26.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US6803744  (SABO ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 4 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [ID]EP1885085  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [ID] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] - [0 29] - [0043] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [AD]DE102007061610  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0020] - [0 29] , [0 46] - [0049] * * figures 1, 4 *
by applicantWO9815069
 EP1885085
 DE102007060811
 DE102007061610
 US7262700
 US2010128044
 EP2067148
 US2003210106
 WO2010125048
 US2002021226