Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807586

EP2807586 - REDUCING WEB BROWSING OVERHEADS WITH EXTERNAL CODE CERTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CEZE, Luis
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / CASCAVAL, Gheorghe C.
5775 Morehose Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / RESHADI, Mohammad H.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13700813.208.01.2013
WO2013US20613
Priority number, dateUS201261591141P26.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591141 P
US20121339912617.02.2012         Original published format: US201213399126
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112278
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807586
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F21/64, H04L29/06, G06F21/51
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG VON WEBNAVIGATION-OVERHEADS MIT EXTERNER CODEZERTIFIZIERUNG[2014/49]
English:REDUCING WEB BROWSING OVERHEADS WITH EXTERNAL CODE CERTIFICATION[2014/49]
French:RÉDUCTION DE SURDÉBITS DE NAVIGATION WEB À L'AIDE D'UNE CERTIFICATION DE CODE EXTERNE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/12]
09.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO02089001  (IBM [US], et al) [X] 40,65,90 * page 9, lines 8-9 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 4 * * page 12, lines 6-25 * * page 15, lines 17-24 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 1-39,41-64,66-89,91-109;
 [I]US7747866  (EVERHART GLENN C [US]) [I] 1-109 * column 2, lines 17-20 * * column 4, lines 21-50 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1091276  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-109 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 *