Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802466

EP2802466 - TYRE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/47]TIRE VALVE
[2017/50]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alligator Ventilfabrik GmbH
Richard-Steiff-Strasse 4
89537 Giengen / DE
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / KLAIBER, Ulf
Im Schlosshau 4
89522 Heidenheim / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13700863.714.01.2013
WO2013EP50567
Priority number, dateDE2012100051113.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012000511
[2014/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104786
Date:18.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802466
Date:19.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60C29/00, B60C23/04
[2017/50]
Former International [2014/47]B60C29/02, B60C29/00, F16K15/20, B60C23/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:REIFENVENTIL[2014/47]
English:TYRE VALVE[2017/50]
French:VALVE DE PNEUMATIQUE[2014/47]
Former [2014/47]TIRE VALVE
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
13.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/40]
14.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011209538  (ZHANG JIANER [CN]) [X] 12 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE202006005269U  (ALLIGATOR VENTILFAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [AD]FR2947214  (SCHRADER SAS [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE20015467U
 DE102010013101
 US2008083272
 FR2947214
 US2010171361